Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/17/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/17/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 12/17/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 12/17/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/18/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/19/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 12/19/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/19/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/19/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/27/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/27/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/27/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/27/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/03/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/11/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/11/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/11/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/08/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/26/2008