Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 12/17/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/17/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 12/18/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 12/19/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 01/23/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 01/23/2008