Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/14/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/14/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/26/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/25/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/25/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 06/28/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/17/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/17/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 09/17/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/26/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 11/08/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/13/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/04/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/09/2008