Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/12/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/12/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 01/12/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/18/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/18/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 01/31/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/15/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/08/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/09/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/09/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/14/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/26/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/17/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/03/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/21/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/21/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/24/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 08/02/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/24/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/01/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/01/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 11/07/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/07/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/09/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/04/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/04/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 12/18/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/21/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/21/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/09/2008