Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 12/13/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/22/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/22/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/14/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/16/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/16/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/16/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/29/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/29/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/29/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/01/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/01/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/01/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/24/2008