Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/12/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 01/12/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/17/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 01/17/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 01/17/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 01/17/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/17/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 01/17/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/17/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 01/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 01/18/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 01/19/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 01/19/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/19/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 01/19/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/19/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/24/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 01/24/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 01/24/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 01/24/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 01/24/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 01/24/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 01/24/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/30/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 01/30/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/30/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 02/08/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 02/08/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/08/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 02/08/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/08/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 02/08/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 02/08/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/08/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/08/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/08/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/08/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/08/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 02/08/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/08/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/08/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/08/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 02/08/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/13/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 02/13/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/13/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/13/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/13/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/13/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/13/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 02/27/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 02/27/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/27/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/27/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 02/27/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/27/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 02/27/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/07/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/07/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/07/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/07/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/07/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/07/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/07/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/07/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 03/07/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/14/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/14/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/14/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 03/21/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/21/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/21/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/21/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 03/28/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/28/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/19/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 04/19/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/19/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/19/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/19/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/19/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/19/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/19/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/19/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/19/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/19/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/19/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/25/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/25/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/25/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/25/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 04/25/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/25/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/25/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/14/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/30/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/05/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 12/11/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 12/12/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 12/18/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/18/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 12/19/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 01/17/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 02/12/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 02/12/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 03/05/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/06/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/01/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/01/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/08/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/08/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 04/09/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/15/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/15/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 04/15/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/15/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/23/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/15/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/24/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/14/2008
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/10/2008