Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 01/16/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/16/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/16/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/16/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/17/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/23/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 01/24/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 01/30/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/05/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/05/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/06/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/06/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/08/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/13/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/28/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/28/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/08/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/12/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/13/2007
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/13/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/21/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/23/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/26/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/26/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/28/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/28/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/16/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/20/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/06/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/10/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/12/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/25/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/25/2007