Refine your search

6 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
02/02/2007 Became Public Law No: 110-2.
02/02/2007 Signed by President.
01/25/2007 Presented to President.
01/23/2007 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1000)
01/19/2007 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 416 - 0 (Roll No. 42).(text: CR H765)
01/16/2007 Introduced in House