Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 12/18/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/26/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/15/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/15/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/01/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/01/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/19/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/19/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/19/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/19/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/19/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/19/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/10/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/10/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/10/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/10/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/10/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/10/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/10/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/10/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/25/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/25/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/09/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/09/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/16/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/16/2008