Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 12/19/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 12/19/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/15/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/15/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/15/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/15/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/15/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/15/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 01/15/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 01/17/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 01/17/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/17/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/17/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/17/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/17/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/17/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/17/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/17/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 01/17/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/17/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/23/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 01/23/2008
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 01/23/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 01/23/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/23/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 01/28/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 01/28/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 01/28/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/29/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/29/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/29/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/06/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/06/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/06/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/13/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/13/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/28/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 03/06/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/11/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/11/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/11/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/31/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/31/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/31/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/08/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/15/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/07/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/19/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/17/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/17/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/17/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/08/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/17/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/08/2008