Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/17/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 01/18/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 01/30/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/30/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/12/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/12/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/13/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/14/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/07/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/07/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/07/2007