There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act to provide for a limitation on the sale, foreclosure, or seizure of property owned by a servicemember during the one-year period following the servicemember's period of military service.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
12/19/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date All Actions
04/30/2008Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/30/2008Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/23/2008Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
04/23/2008Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
04/16/2008Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
12/21/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
12/19/2007Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/19/2007Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (18)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs12/19/2007 Referred to
04/30/2008 Markup by
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity12/21/2007 Referred to
04/16/2008 Hearings by
04/23/2008 Markup by
04/23/2008 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4883. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/19/2007)

Amends the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act of 1940 to extend from 90 days to one year the period following release from active duty during which a member of the Armed Forces shall be protected from mortgage foreclosure.