There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Helping Our Veterans to Keep Their Homes Act of 2008

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to make certain improvements in the home loan guaranty programs administered by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
12/19/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
04/30/2008Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
04/30/2008Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/23/2008Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
04/23/2008Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
04/16/2008Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
12/21/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
12/19/2007Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/19/2007Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs12/19/2007 Referred to
04/30/2008 Markup by
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity12/21/2007 Referred to
04/16/2008 Hearings by
04/23/2008 Markup by
04/23/2008 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4884. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/19/2007)

Helping Our Veterans to Keep Their Homes Act of 2008 - Increases from 90% to 100% of the reasonable value of a veteran's dwelling or farm residence the amount of the loan to be guaranteed or made in the case of a loan to refinance certain loans.

Repeals the current fee schedule with respect to veterans' housing and small business loans. Changes the loan fee for such loans to 1% of the total amount of the loan guaranteed, insured, or made, or in the case of a loan assumption, the unpaid principal balance of the loan on the date of the transfer of the property.

Extends the demonstration projects involving: (1) adjustable rate mortgages through FY2018; and (2) hybrid adjustable rate through FY2012.

Increases the maximum loan guaranty amount of the Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Freddie Mac) conforming limit limitation determined for a single-family residence, as adjusted for the year involved.

Provides for an annual inflation increase in home loan guaranty amounts.

Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to review and streamline the process of guaranteeing home loans for the purchase of a condominium.