Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 01/16/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 01/16/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/16/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/16/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/16/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/28/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 01/28/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 01/29/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 01/29/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/06/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/25/2008
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/25/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/08/2008