Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/15/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/15/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/16/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 01/16/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/16/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/23/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/23/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/23/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/23/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/23/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/23/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/23/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/06/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/06/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/06/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/06/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 02/06/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/06/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 02/12/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/12/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/25/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/25/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/25/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/25/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/25/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/25/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/25/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/25/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/25/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/27/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/27/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/04/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/04/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/04/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/11/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/13/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/13/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/09/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/09/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/09/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/09/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/09/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/09/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/09/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 04/09/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/10/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/15/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/16/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/16/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/30/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 05/06/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/08/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/08/2008
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/08/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/08/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/08/2008
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 05/08/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/08/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/14/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/14/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/14/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/14/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/14/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/14/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/14/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/14/2008
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/15/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 05/21/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/21/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/21/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/21/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/21/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/21/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/03/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/04/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/04/2008