Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 01/28/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/28/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/28/2008
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 01/28/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/28/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 01/29/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 01/29/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/29/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 01/29/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 02/06/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/06/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 02/06/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/06/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/06/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/06/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/07/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 02/07/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 02/07/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/12/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 02/12/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/12/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/12/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/12/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/14/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/14/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/25/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/25/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/26/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/26/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/26/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 02/26/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/26/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/05/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/05/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/05/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 03/05/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/05/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/05/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/11/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/12/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/13/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/14/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/02/2008
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 04/02/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/03/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/10/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 04/10/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/15/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/16/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/16/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/17/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/17/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/23/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/29/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/12/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/12/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/17/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/23/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/23/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/23/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/08/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/14/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/14/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/15/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/15/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/22/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 07/22/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/22/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/22/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/24/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 07/24/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/08/2008
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/08/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/22/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/22/2008