Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/17/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/17/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/17/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/17/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/17/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/17/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 01/23/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/23/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 01/23/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/23/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/23/2008
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 01/28/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 01/28/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/28/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/06/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/06/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/06/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 02/06/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/06/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/06/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 02/06/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/06/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/06/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/06/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/06/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/06/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/06/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/06/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/06/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/06/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/14/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/14/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/14/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/14/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/14/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/14/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/14/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/14/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/04/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/04/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/11/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/13/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/03/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/09/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/14/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 04/15/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/10/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/10/2008