Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/16/2008
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 01/22/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 01/22/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/22/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 01/22/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 01/22/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 01/22/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 01/22/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/22/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/22/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 01/22/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/22/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 01/22/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/22/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/22/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 01/22/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 01/22/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 01/22/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 01/22/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 01/23/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/23/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 01/23/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/23/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/23/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 01/23/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/23/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/23/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/12/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/12/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/12/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/12/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/12/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 02/12/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 02/12/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 02/12/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/12/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/12/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 02/12/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 02/25/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 02/25/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/25/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/13/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/15/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/22/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/10/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 06/10/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/12/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/18/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/19/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/16/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/16/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 07/16/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/24/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 08/01/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 09/08/2008