There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Multinational Species Conservation Funds Reauthorization Act of 2007

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Multinational Species Conservation Funds Reauthorization Act of 2007

Short Titles as Introduced

Multinational Species Conservation Funds Reauthorization Act of 2007

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Multinational Species Conservation Funds Reauthorization Act of 2007

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Multinational Species Conservation Funds Reauthorization Act of 2007

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize the African Elephant Conservation Act and the Rhinoceros and Tiger Conservation Act of 1994.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
12/06/2007Became Public Law No: 110-132. (TXT | PDF)
12/06/2007Signed by President.
11/26/2007Presented to President.
11/16/2007Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S14655-14656)
10/29/2007By Senator Boxer from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 110-211.
08/02/2007Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Boxer without amendment. Without written report.
07/23/2007Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text as passed in House: CR H8201)
07/23/2007Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 110-244.
01/04/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (26)

Date Chamber
12/06/2007Became Public Law No: 110-132. (TXT | PDF)
12/06/2007Signed by President.
11/26/2007HousePresented to President.
11/16/2007SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/16/2007SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S14655-14656)
10/29/2007SenateBy Senator Boxer from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 110-211.
08/02/2007SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 322.
08/02/2007SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Boxer without amendment. Without written report.
07/31/2007SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/24/2007SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
07/23/2007-12:43pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/23/2007-12:43pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text as passed in House: CR H8201)
07/23/2007-12:40pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 50.
07/23/2007-12:40pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8201-8202)
07/23/2007-12:40pmHouseMr. Grijalva moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/23/2007HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 153.
07/23/2007HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 110-244.
06/28/2007HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/28/2007HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/22/2007HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, and Oceans
03/22/2007HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, and Oceans
03/13/2007HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, and Oceans
02/07/2007HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/05/2007HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E6-7)
01/04/2007HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
01/04/2007HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/12/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/23/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/01/2007

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/04/2007 Referred to
06/28/2007 Markup by
07/23/2007 Reported by H. Rept. 110-244
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, and Oceans02/07/2007 Referred to
03/13/2007 Hearings by
03/22/2007 Markup by
03/22/2007 Reported by
Senate Environment and Public Works07/24/2007 Referred to
07/31/2007 Markup by
08/02/2007 Reported by S. Rept. 110-211

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.50. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-132 (12/06/2007)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on July 23, 2007. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Multinational Species Conservation Funds Reauthorization Act of 2007 - Amends the African Elephant Conservation Act and the Rhinoceros and Tiger Conservation Act of 1994 to: (1) authorize appropriations for FY2007-FY2012 for such Acts; (2) increase the amount that may be used for administrative expenses to carry out such Acts; and (3) repeal provisions requiring the Secretary of the Interior to notify countries regarding the approval of conservation projects for African elephants, rhinoceros, and tigers.