Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/17/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/17/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/17/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 01/17/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 01/17/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/17/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 01/30/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/30/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/30/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 01/30/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 01/30/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/30/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/30/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/30/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 01/30/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 01/30/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 01/30/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 01/30/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/30/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 01/30/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/30/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 01/30/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/30/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 01/30/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/30/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 01/30/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/30/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 01/30/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/30/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 01/31/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/31/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 01/31/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 01/31/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 01/31/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/31/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 01/31/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 01/31/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 01/31/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/31/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/31/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/31/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 01/31/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 01/31/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/13/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/13/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/13/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/13/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/13/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/13/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/13/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/13/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/13/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/13/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 02/13/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/13/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/13/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/14/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/14/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 02/16/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/16/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/16/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 02/16/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/16/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/16/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 02/16/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/05/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/05/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/05/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/15/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/15/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/15/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/15/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/15/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/15/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/21/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/21/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/28/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/28/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/28/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/28/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/29/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 03/29/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/17/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/17/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/17/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/17/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/17/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/20/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/20/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/20/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/20/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/20/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/07/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/07/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/07/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/15/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/15/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/15/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/24/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/24/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/24/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/07/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/07/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/07/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/14/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/14/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 06/14/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/14/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 06/14/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/14/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/20/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/20/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/20/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 06/26/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/26/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/26/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/18/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/27/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 08/02/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 08/02/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 08/02/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/20/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/20/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/27/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 09/27/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/04/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/04/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 10/04/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/04/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/18/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/30/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 12/06/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 12/12/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 12/19/2007
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 01/23/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/23/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/03/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/06/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/14/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/01/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/01/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/17/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/23/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 05/06/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/03/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/10/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/19/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/10/2008