There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Ultrasound Informed Consent Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To ensure that women seeking an abortion receive an ultrasound and the opportunity to review the ultrasound before giving informed consent to receive an abortion.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/17/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
01/17/2008Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/17/2008Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/17/2008Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (72)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/17/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 01/17/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 01/17/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 01/17/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/29/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 01/29/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/29/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 01/29/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 01/29/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/29/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 01/29/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/29/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/29/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/29/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/29/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/29/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 01/29/2008
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 01/29/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 02/14/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/14/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 02/14/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/14/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/14/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/14/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/14/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/14/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/14/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/14/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/05/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/05/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/05/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/05/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/05/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/13/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/13/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/13/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/13/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/13/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/13/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 03/13/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/01/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/01/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 04/01/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/01/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/01/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 04/01/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/01/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/01/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/15/2008
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/15/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/15/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/15/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/15/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 04/15/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/01/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 05/01/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/24/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/24/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/24/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/24/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/28/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/31/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/31/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/17/2008 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health01/17/2008 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5032. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/17/2008)

Ultrasound Informed Consent Act - Amends the Public Health Service Act to require abortion providers, before a woman gives informed consent to any part of an abortion, to perform an obstetric ultrasound on the pregnant woman, explain the results, display the ultrasound images so the woman may view them, and provide a medical description of the ultrasound images, including the dimensions of the embryo or fetus and the presence of external members and internal organs, if present and viewable. Provides for: (1) civil penalties for willful failure to comply; and (2) a medical emergency exception.

Prohibits construing this Act to require a woman to view the images or penalizing the physician or the woman if she refuses to look at the images.