Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/17/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 01/17/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 01/17/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 01/17/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/29/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 01/29/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/29/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 01/29/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 01/29/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/29/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 01/29/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/29/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/29/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/29/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/29/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/29/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 01/29/2008
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 01/29/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 02/14/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/14/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 02/14/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/14/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/14/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/14/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/14/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/14/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/14/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/14/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/05/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/05/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/05/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/05/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/05/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/13/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/13/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/13/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/13/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/13/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/13/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 03/13/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/01/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/01/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 04/01/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/01/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/01/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 04/01/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/01/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/01/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/15/2008
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/15/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/15/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/15/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/15/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 04/15/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/01/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 05/01/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/24/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/24/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/24/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/24/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/28/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/31/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/31/2008