Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 01/17/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 01/18/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/18/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/18/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/18/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/18/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 01/22/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 01/22/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/22/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 01/22/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 01/23/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/23/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/29/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 01/29/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 01/29/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/29/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/29/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 01/29/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 01/29/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/29/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/29/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/29/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/29/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 01/29/2008
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 01/29/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/29/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 02/06/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/06/2008
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 02/06/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/06/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/06/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 02/06/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/06/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/06/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/12/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/12/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/12/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/12/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/12/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/12/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/25/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/25/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/28/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/28/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/28/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/04/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/06/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/10/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/31/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/31/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/31/2008
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/31/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/31/2008