Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 01/23/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 01/29/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/29/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/29/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/06/2008
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/06/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/06/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/06/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/06/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/06/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/06/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/06/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/06/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/06/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/06/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/07/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 02/12/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/12/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/12/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/12/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/14/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 02/25/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/25/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/25/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/25/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/25/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/25/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/26/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 02/26/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 03/04/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/04/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/04/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/04/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/06/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/01/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/03/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/10/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/14/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/15/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/24/2008
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 04/24/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/13/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/10/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 06/12/2008