Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 01/22/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/23/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/28/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 01/28/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/28/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/28/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/28/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/28/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/28/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 01/29/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 01/29/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 01/29/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 01/29/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/29/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/29/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/29/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/29/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/29/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 02/06/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/06/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/06/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/06/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/06/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/06/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/06/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/06/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 02/06/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/06/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 02/06/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/07/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/07/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/12/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 02/12/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/12/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/12/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/12/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/12/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/12/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/13/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/25/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/25/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/27/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/11/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/10/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/24/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/22/2008