Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 01/17/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 01/17/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 01/28/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/07/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/03/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/08/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/15/2008