Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 01/17/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/18/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/18/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/18/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 01/18/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/18/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/18/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/18/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/18/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/22/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 01/24/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/24/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/30/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/31/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/05/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/05/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/05/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/05/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/08/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/12/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 02/16/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/16/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/16/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/16/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/16/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/16/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 02/16/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/16/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/16/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/27/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/27/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/01/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/05/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/24/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/08/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/11/2007