Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/22/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/23/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 01/23/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/23/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 01/23/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 01/23/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 01/23/2008
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 01/28/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/28/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 01/28/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 01/28/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 01/29/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 01/29/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 01/29/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/29/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/06/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 02/06/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/06/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/07/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/12/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/12/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 02/14/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 02/14/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 02/14/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/14/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/19/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/25/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/25/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/25/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 02/26/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 03/04/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 04/02/2008
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 09/08/2008