Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 01/17/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 01/17/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/17/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 01/17/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/17/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/19/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 01/19/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/31/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 01/31/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/31/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 01/31/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 02/16/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 02/16/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/16/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 03/01/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/09/2007
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/21/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/22/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/22/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/03/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/16/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 10/18/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/09/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/09/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/09/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/09/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 04/09/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/09/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/09/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/09/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/09/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 04/09/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/09/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/15/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/15/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/15/2008
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 04/15/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/15/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/15/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/15/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/15/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/15/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/17/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/17/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/07/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/08/2008