There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To extend the Protect America Act of 2007 for 15 days.

Official Title as Introduced

To extend the Protect America Act of 2007 for 30 days.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
01/31/2008Became Public Law No: 110-182. (TXT | PDF)
01/31/2008Signed by President.
01/30/2008Presented to President.
01/29/2008Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S457)
01/29/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H510)
01/23/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/31/2008Became Public Law No: 110-182. (TXT | PDF)
01/31/2008Signed by President.
01/30/2008HousePresented to President.
01/30/2008SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
01/29/2008SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S457)
01/29/2008-4:03pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
01/29/2008-4:03pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/29/2008-4:03pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H510)
01/29/2008-3:22pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5104.
01/29/2008-3:22pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H510-517)
01/29/2008-3:22pmHouseMr. Conyers moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
01/23/2008HouseReferred to House Intelligence (Permanent)
01/23/2008HouseReferred to House Judiciary
01/23/2008HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/23/2008HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 01/23/2008

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/23/2008 Referred to
House Intelligence (Permanent Select)01/23/2008 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.5104. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-182 (01/31/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on January 29, 2008. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the Protect America Act of 2007 (currently set to expire on February 1, 2008) to extend its authority for 15 days.