Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/14/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/14/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/14/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/08/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 04/08/2008
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/23/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/05/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/09/2008