Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 01/23/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/23/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 01/23/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 01/28/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 01/28/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/28/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 01/28/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 01/28/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/28/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/28/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/28/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 01/28/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 01/28/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 01/29/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/29/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 01/29/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/29/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/29/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/29/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 01/29/2008
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 01/29/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 01/29/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 01/29/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/29/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 01/29/2008
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 01/29/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 01/29/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/06/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/13/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/13/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/13/2008
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 02/13/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/26/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/26/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/03/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/03/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/04/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/04/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 03/05/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 03/06/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/06/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/10/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/10/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/10/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/12/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/13/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/01/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/01/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/01/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/13/2008