Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 01/23/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 01/23/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 02/06/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/06/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/06/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 02/06/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 02/14/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 02/14/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/14/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/14/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/14/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/25/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 02/26/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/26/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/26/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/28/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/28/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/04/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/04/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/04/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/05/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/05/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/05/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/10/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/10/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/08/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/08/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/06/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/09/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/16/2008