Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/06/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/06/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/06/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/06/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/06/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/06/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/06/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/07/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/07/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/31/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/30/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/09/2008