Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/23/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/23/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 01/23/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/07/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/07/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/07/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/07/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/04/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/10/2008