Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/12/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 02/12/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 02/12/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/12/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 02/12/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/12/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/12/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/14/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/14/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/14/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/14/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 02/14/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/14/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/14/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 02/14/2008
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 02/14/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/14/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 02/14/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 02/14/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 02/14/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/14/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/26/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/26/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/26/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 02/26/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/26/2008
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 02/27/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 02/27/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/05/2008
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 03/11/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/02/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/02/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/08/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/08/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 04/08/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 04/08/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/10/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 04/10/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/10/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/14/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/14/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/15/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/16/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/16/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/17/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/22/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/22/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/22/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/22/2008
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/23/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/23/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/30/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/06/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/23/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/16/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/16/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/16/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/17/2008