Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/06/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/06/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/06/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/06/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/06/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/06/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/06/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/06/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/06/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 02/06/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/06/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 02/06/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/06/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/06/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 02/07/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 02/07/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 02/07/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 02/07/2008
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 02/07/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 02/07/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/07/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/07/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/12/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/12/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/12/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/12/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/12/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/14/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/14/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/25/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 02/25/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/25/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/25/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/25/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/25/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 02/25/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/25/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/28/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/28/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/28/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/28/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/28/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 02/28/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/28/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/04/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/04/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/04/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/04/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/04/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/10/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/10/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/10/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 03/11/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/01/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/01/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/01/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/23/2008