Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/06/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/06/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/12/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/12/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/12/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/13/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/14/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/25/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/25/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/26/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/27/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 02/27/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/27/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/04/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/06/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/12/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/14/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/14/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/29/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/01/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/19/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/22/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/08/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/08/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/14/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/16/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 07/23/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/29/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/08/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/08/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/18/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/23/2008