Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/06/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/12/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 02/12/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/25/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/26/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/27/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/14/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/30/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/08/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/15/2008