Summary: H.R.5173 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Information (Except Text)

There is one summary for H.R.5173. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/29/2008)

Delays until April 1, 2009, implementation of proposed changes to payment rules under title XIX (Medicaid) of the Social Security Act for case management and targeted case management services.

Prohibits the Secretary of Health and Human Services, before such date, from taking any action to restrict coverage or payment under Medicaid if such action is more restrictive than the administrative action, policy, or practice that applies to coverage of, or payment for, such services under Medicaid on December 3, 2007.

Makes null and void any such action taken by the Secretary between December 4, 2007, and March 31, 2009, that is based in whole or in part on such interim final rule.