Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/07/2008
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/07/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/12/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/12/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/12/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/12/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/12/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/12/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/12/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/12/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/12/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 02/12/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/12/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/12/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 02/12/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/14/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/14/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/14/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/14/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/14/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/14/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 02/14/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/14/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/14/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 02/14/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/14/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/14/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/14/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/14/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/25/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/25/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/25/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/25/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/25/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 02/25/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/25/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 02/25/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/25/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/25/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/25/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/25/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/25/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/25/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/25/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/25/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 02/25/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/25/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/25/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/25/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/25/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 02/25/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/25/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/27/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 02/27/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/27/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/27/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/27/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/27/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 02/27/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/27/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/27/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 02/27/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/27/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/27/2008
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 02/27/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/27/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/27/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 02/27/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/27/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/27/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/06/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 03/06/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 03/06/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/06/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/06/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 03/06/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/06/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/06/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/06/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 03/06/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/06/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/06/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/06/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/06/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 03/13/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/13/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/13/2008
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/13/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/13/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/13/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/13/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/13/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/13/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/14/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/31/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/31/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/31/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/31/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/10/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 04/17/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/17/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/29/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/05/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/08/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/13/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/10/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 09/15/2008