Refine your search

7 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
03/15/2007 Became Public Law No: 110-12. (TXT | PDF)
03/15/2007 Signed by President.
03/05/2007 Presented to President.
02/17/2007 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
02/17/2007 Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2217-2218)
01/29/2007 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 405 - 3 (Roll no. 58).(text: CR H949)
01/17/2007 Introduced in House