Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 01/17/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/22/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/31/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/31/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 01/31/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/05/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/27/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 02/27/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/23/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/16/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/16/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/17/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/18/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/20/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/20/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/25/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/25/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/08/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/08/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/14/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/15/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/18/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/09/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/10/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 12/04/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/12/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/12/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/14/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/14/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/15/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/19/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/22/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/16/2008
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/23/2008