There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Semper Fi Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To rescind funds appropriated by the Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2008, for the City of Berkeley, California, and any entities located in such city, and to provide that such funds shall be transferred to the Operation and Maintenance, Marine Corps account of the Department of Defense for the purposes of recruiting.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/06/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
02/06/2008Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/06/2008Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (92)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 02/06/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 02/06/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 02/06/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/06/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 02/07/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/07/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/07/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/07/2008
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 02/07/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/07/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/07/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 02/07/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/07/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 02/07/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 02/07/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/07/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/07/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/12/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 02/12/2008
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 02/12/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/12/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 02/12/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/12/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/12/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/12/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/12/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 02/12/2008
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 02/12/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/12/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/14/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/14/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/14/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/14/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/14/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 02/14/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/14/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 02/14/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/14/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/14/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/28/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 02/28/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/28/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/28/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/28/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 02/28/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 02/28/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/04/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/04/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/04/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/15/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Appropriations02/06/2008 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5222. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/06/2008)

Semper Fi Act - Rescinds all amounts appropriated by the Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2008 for the city of Berkeley, California, or entities in such city.

Transfers the rescinded amounts to the Operation and Maintenance, Marine Corps account of the Department of Defense (DOD) for FY2008, to be used for recruiting.