Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 02/06/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 02/06/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 02/06/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/06/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 02/07/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/07/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/07/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/07/2008
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 02/07/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/07/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/07/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 02/07/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/07/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 02/07/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 02/07/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/07/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/07/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/12/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 02/12/2008
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 02/12/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/12/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 02/12/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/12/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/12/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/12/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/12/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 02/12/2008
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 02/12/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/12/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/14/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/14/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/14/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/14/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/14/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 02/14/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/14/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 02/14/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/14/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/14/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/28/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 02/28/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/28/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/28/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/28/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 02/28/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 02/28/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/04/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/04/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/04/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/15/2008