Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 02/06/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/06/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/06/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/12/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/12/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 02/12/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/12/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/12/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/12/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/26/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/05/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/05/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/05/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/31/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/29/2008
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 05/21/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/10/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/17/2008