Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/06/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 02/06/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/06/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/06/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/16/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/16/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/16/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 02/16/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/16/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/16/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/16/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 02/16/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/16/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 02/16/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/16/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/16/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/16/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/16/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/16/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/01/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/01/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/01/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/01/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/01/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/01/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/08/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/08/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/08/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/08/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/08/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/08/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/08/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/08/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/08/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/08/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/08/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/08/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/08/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/08/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 03/08/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/08/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/08/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/08/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/08/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/08/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/08/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/08/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/08/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/08/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/08/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/08/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/08/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/08/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/08/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/08/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/08/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/08/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 03/08/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/08/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/08/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/08/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/08/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 03/08/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/21/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 03/21/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/21/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/24/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/24/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/15/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/26/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 08/02/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/22/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/22/2007