Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 02/07/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/12/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/12/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/12/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/12/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/13/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/13/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 02/13/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/13/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/13/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/13/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/13/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/13/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/13/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 02/14/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/14/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/25/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/25/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 02/25/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/25/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/27/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/27/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/27/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/27/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/04/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/04/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/04/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/04/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/11/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/11/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/11/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/12/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/12/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/13/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/31/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/31/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/31/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/31/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/31/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/31/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/08/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/08/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/08/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/14/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/14/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/14/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/16/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/16/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/16/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/16/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/17/2008
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/17/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/23/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/23/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/23/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/23/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 04/23/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/01/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/06/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/08/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/08/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/13/2008
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/13/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/13/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/13/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/13/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/15/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/15/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/20/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/22/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/22/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/04/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/04/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/04/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/04/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/04/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/11/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/11/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/11/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/11/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/11/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/11/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/11/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/11/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/12/2008
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/12/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/17/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/17/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/17/2008
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 06/17/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/18/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/18/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/19/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/24/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/24/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/25/2008
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/25/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/08/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/08/2008
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/08/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/08/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/08/2008
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/08/2008