Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/17/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/17/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 01/17/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 01/17/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/23/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/29/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 01/30/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/31/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/06/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/06/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/13/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 02/27/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/28/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/07/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/19/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 03/22/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/16/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/08/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/12/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 09/10/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/19/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/03/2007