Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/12/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/12/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/12/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/12/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/12/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/12/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/12/2008
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 02/12/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 02/12/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/12/2008
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/12/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/12/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/12/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/12/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 02/12/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/12/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/12/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/14/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/14/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/14/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/14/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/14/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/14/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/14/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/25/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/25/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/25/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/25/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/25/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/25/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/25/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 02/25/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/25/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 02/25/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/25/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/27/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/27/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/27/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/27/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 03/04/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/04/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/04/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/04/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/06/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 03/06/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/06/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/10/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/10/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/14/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/14/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/14/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/14/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/14/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/31/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/31/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/31/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/31/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/08/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/08/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/08/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/08/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/17/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 04/22/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/22/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/22/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/24/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/01/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/01/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/01/2008
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 05/01/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/05/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/05/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/05/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/20/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/20/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/20/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/20/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/21/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/21/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/03/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/03/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/03/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/04/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/04/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/04/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/04/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/05/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/12/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/12/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/12/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/17/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/17/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/17/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/17/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/23/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/09/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/09/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/09/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/09/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/09/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/09/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/09/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/10/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/10/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/10/2008
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/10/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/14/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/14/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/14/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/16/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/16/2008
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 07/17/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/24/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/24/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/24/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 07/24/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 08/01/2008